Ravi narain
TīmeklisRavi Narain is the eldest son of Andy and Kushla Narain. Andy Narain was a New Zealand born Indian and his wife was born in India but moved to Fiji when she was five years old, later coming to ... Tīmeklis employer = National Stock Exchange of India job = Vice Chairman loc = Mumbai, India name = Ravi Narain pic = Ravi_narain.jpg url = nse-india.com}} Ravi Narain is non-executive vice-chairman of the board of directors of the National Stock Exchange of India (NSE). He served as managing director and CEO from 2001 until April 2013, …
Ravi narain
Did you know?
TīmeklisAmana Development Consulting. Founded Amana to help enterprise clients navigate the world’s first legislated + mandated CSR … TīmeklisRavi Narain is Chairman at India Index Services & Products Ltd. See Ravi Narain's compensation, career history, education, & memberships.
Tīmeklis2024. gada 7. sept. · The Enforcement Directorate (ED) has arrested Ravi Narain, who is the former CEO and Managing Director of the National Stock Exchange (NSE), in relation to a money laundering case and an illegal phone tapping scam against his employees.. According to the officials, ex-NSE chief Ravi Narain has been arrested … TīmeklisCBI examines NSE’s former MD Ravi Narain in ‘co-location’ case ... Narain was the NSE’s managing director and chief executive officer from April 1994 till March 31, …
Tīmeklis2024. gada 20. febr. · NEW DELHI: Ravi Narain, Chitra Ramkrishna’s predecessor at NSE (National Stock Exchange of India Limited), was questioned by the Central Bureau of Investigation (CBI) in Delhi on Saturday. TīmeklisRAVI NARAIN bearing DIN: 00740058 is not Disqualified by ROC u/s 164(2) and DIN is not deactivated due to non-filing of DIR-3 KYC Form. The first company RAVI NARAIN was appointed as Director is SPLENDOR HEIGHTS RESIDENCES PRIVATE LIMITED and the most recent directorship is with HITACHI INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED.
Tīmeklis2024. gada 20. febr. · Ravi Narain was managing director and the CEO of the National Stock Exchange from April 1994 till March 2013. He had at the longest tenure at bourses. Thereafter he was appointed as vice chairman in non executive category at NSE from 1st April 2013 till 1st June 2024 after which he resigned.
TīmeklisRavi Narain was critical in helping to develop India’s securities markets. He helped set up the Securities and Exchange Board of India, the country’s first market regulatory … dulanski group nyTīmeklis2024. gada 2. jūn. · Corporates Thomson Reuters Updated: June 02, 2024 3:29 pm IST. Mumbai: The former chief executive of the National Stock Exchange (NSE), Ravi Narain, has resigned from its board, an NSE source said ... dula od zbojnikaTīmeklisRavi Narain is Former Vice Chairman at National Stock Exchange of India Ltd. See Ravi Narain's compensation, career history, education, & memberships. dulap krazTīmeklisRavi Narain & Associates. Skip to Content. By using this website, you agree to our use of cookies. We use cookies to provide you with a great experience and to help our … dulantzi eskolaTīmeklisRavi Narain was critical in helping to develop India’s securities markets. He helped set up the Securities and Exchange Board of India, the country’s first market regulatory agency, as well as the National Stock Exchange of India, the country’s first fully electronic exchange with a national reach. By increasing the transparency of prices ... dula ostravaTīmeklisCBI examines NSE’s former MD Ravi Narain in ‘co-location’ case ... Narain was the NSE’s managing director and chief executive officer from April 1994 till March 31, 2013. He was appointed ... rc jet ski toyTīmeklis2024. gada 16. sept. · People like Harshad Mehta, Ketan Parekh, Ravi Narain and Chitra Ramakrishna had one thing in common - greed. Markets may not ... September 07, 2024, Wednesday. Ex-NSE MD Ravi Narain sent to 2-day ED custody in money laundering case. rc jet ski for sale